Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10996111 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2021 | B2 | US2020284659 | 10.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20190025780 | 06.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102630999B | Global Dossier | 01.02.2024 | B1 | KR20200108136 | 17.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20190025780 | 06.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111667787B | Global Dossier | 24.05.2024 | B | CN111667787 | 15.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20190025780 | 06.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3706112 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20190025780 | 06.03.2019 |