EP3875805 - PLANET CARRIER, PLANETARY GEAR, DRIVE TRAIN AND WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flender GmbH Alfred-Flender-Straße 77 46395 Bocholt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/36] | For all designated states Flender GmbH Alfred-Flender-Strasse 77 46395 Bocholt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lensing, Volker Vardingholter Straße 31 46414 Rhede / DE | 02 /
Funke, Timo Hamminkelner Straße 30 46395 Bochold / DE | 03 /
Telaar, Carolin Hemdener Weg 104b 46399 Bocholt / DE | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/36] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 20161481.5 | 06.03.2020 | [2021/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875805 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/08, F03D15/00 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
F16H57/082 (EP,US);
F03D15/00 (EP,US);
F16H57/0479 (EP,US);
F05B2260/40311 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLANETENTRÄGER, PLANETENGETRIEBE, ANTRIEBSSTRANG UND WINDKRAFTANLAGE | [2021/36] | English: | PLANET CARRIER, PLANETARY GEAR, DRIVE TRAIN AND WIND TURBINE | [2021/36] | French: | PORTE SATELLITES, ENGRENAGE ÉPICYCLOÏDAL, CHAINE CINÉMATIQUE ET ÉOLIENNE | [2021/36] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/34] | 04.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE102007003676 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]); | [XYI]DE102013221862 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]); | [Y]EP3564121 (BELL HELICOPTER TEXTRON INC [US]) | by applicant | EP2677209 | DE102014203587 | EP3587863 | EP20190171876 |