Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3719901 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP20161662 US201916353985 US202117215941



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11575139Global Dossier 07.02.2023B2
US2021234179 29.07.2021A1
Priority number Date
US201916353985 14.03.2019
US202117215941 29.03.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US11011765Global Dossier 18.05.2021B2
US2020295389 17.09.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201916353985 14.03.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3719901Global Dossier 16.12.2020A3
EP3719901 07.10.2020A2
Priority number Date
US201916353985 14.03.2019