EP3879227 - OPTICAL SURVEYING INSTRUMENT WITH MOVABLE MIRROR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trimble Inc. 10368 Westmoor Drive Westminster, CO 80021 / US | [2024/29] |
Former [2021/37] | For all designated states Trimble Jena GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOGEL, Michael 07629 Schleifreisen / DE | 02 /
FRANK, Andreas 98716 Elgersburg / DE | [2021/43] |
Former [2021/37] | 01 /
VOGEL, Michael 07629 Schleifreissen / DE | ||
02 /
FRANK, Andreas 98716 Elgersburg / DE | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 20162053.1 | 10.03.2020 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3879227 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00, G01C25/00, G02B3/14, G02B26/10 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
G01C15/002 (EP,US);
G01C25/00 (EP);
G01S17/08 (EP);
G01S7/4972 (EP);
G02B26/101 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES VERMESSUNGSINSTRUMENT MIT BEWEGLICHEM SPIEGEL | [2021/37] | English: | OPTICAL SURVEYING INSTRUMENT WITH MOVABLE MIRROR | [2021/37] | French: | INSTRUMENT DE SURVEILLANCE OPTIQUE COMPORTANT UN MIROIR MOBILE | [2021/37] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 28.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007180716 (HERTZMAN MIKAEL [SE]) [Y] 7,8 * paragraphs [0020] , [0058]; claim 1 *; | [A]US2014307252 (HINDERLING JÜRG [CH], et al) [A] 2 * paragraph [0035] *; | [XYI]US2016025491 (KOTZUR NORBERT [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,10-13,15 * paragraphs [0057] - [0079] - [0108] , [0116]; figures 1,2,3,4 * [Y] 7-9 [I] 2,4-6,14; | [Y]US2016209500 (MARKENDORF ALBERT [CH]) [Y] 9* paragraphs [0024] , [0025] * |