EP3709522 - DATA COMMUNICATION CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics France 134-136 Avenue Aristide Briand 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2024/30] |
Former [2020/38] | For all designated states STMICROELECTRONICS SA 29 boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSSON, Pierre 17 Bis Rue Thiers 38000 GRENOBLE / FR | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 20162251.1 | 10.03.2020 | [2020/38] | Priority number, date | FR20190002607 | 14.03.2019 Original published format: FR 1902607 | [2020/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3709522 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/40, G06F1/26, G06F1/16, // H03K17/00 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
H04B1/40 (EP,CN);
G06F13/4068 (US);
G06F1/1632 (EP);
G06F1/266 (EP);
G06F13/4282 (US);
H02J50/10 (US);
H02J50/80 (US);
H04B5/24 (US);
H04B5/79 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSCHALTKREIS | [2020/38] | English: | DATA COMMUNICATION CIRCUIT | [2020/38] | French: | CIRCUIT DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 18.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4985783 (FALCK FRANCIS [FR]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]US2015286605 (WATERS DERIC WAYNE [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]WO2016066371 (PHILIPS LIGHTING HOLDING BV [NL]) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [XI]WO2018234242 (PHILIPS LIGHTING HOLDING BV [NL]) [X] 1-4,7-9,13,14 * line 8 - page 1, line 15 * * page 5, line 27 - page 8, line 14; figures 1A,1B,2 * [I] 5,6,10-12,15,16; | [A]US2019064879 (JEANSONNE JEFFREY KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * |