EP3682871 - APPARATUS FOR ADHESIVE REMOVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive, Mail Code 110 Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Searle, Garry 245 Warren Drive Norfolk, MA 02056 / US | 02 /
Hwang, Charles 117 Great Plain Avenue Wellesley, MA 02482 / US | 03 /
Burns, Deborah 58 Beaver Brook Road Westford, MA 01866 / US | 04 /
Burns, Bruce 58 Beaver Brook Road Westford, MA 01866 / US | 05 /
Mason, David 99 North Reservation Terrace Newburyport, MA 01950 / US | [2024/34] |
Former [2020/30] | 01 /
Searle, Garry 245 Warren Drive Norfolk, 02056 / US | ||
02 /
Hwang, Charles 117 Great Plain Avenue Wellesley, MA 02482 / US | |||
03 /
Burns, Deborah 58 Beaver Brook Road Westford, MA 01866 / US | |||
04 /
Burns, Bruce 58 Beaver Brook Road Westford, MA 01866 / US | |||
05 /
Mason, David 99 North Reservation Terrace Newburyport, MA 01950 / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 20162419.4 | 05.03.2013 | [2020/30] | Priority number, date | US201261606929P | 05.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261606929 P | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3682871 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/22, A61N1/04 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
A61M5/14248 (EP,US);
A61M5/16831 (EP,US);
A61M5/1684 (EP,US);
G16H20/13 (EP,US);
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14252 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14268 (EP,US);
A61M2205/18 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3569 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3576 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,US);
A61M2205/50 (EP,US);
A61M2205/502 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2205/582 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] |
Former [2020/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABLÖSEN VON KLEBER | [2020/30] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ADHESIVE REMOVAL | [2020/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DÉTACHER DES ADHÉSIFS | [2020/30] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 13.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13757089.1 / EP2822543 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0862924 (GRAPHIC CONTROLS CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2007249981 (HURWITZ MARNI M [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]US2013060184 (REA RYAN MICHAEL [US]) [E] 1-15* the whole document *; | [E]US2013172724 (ALI MOHAMED AZIZ MOHAMED AZIZ [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5858001 | US5858005 | US5957895 | US6074369 | US6551276 | US6589229 | US6656158 | US6740059 | US6852104 | US6960192 | US7052251 | US7109878 | US7128727 | US7226278 | US7250037 | US7303549 | US2008097381 | EP2019206 | US2009048563 | US2009062778 | US7678079 | US7857131 |