EP3753812 - VEHICLE SIDE BODY STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Tadashi c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Takeshi c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 20162592.8 | 12.03.2020 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | JP20190112694 | 18.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019112694 | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3753812 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15, B62D25/02, B62D25/16, B62D27/02, B62D25/04, B60J5/04 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
B62D21/157 (EP,US);
B62D25/04 (EP,CN,US);
B60J5/0427 (EP);
B60J5/0429 (US);
B60J5/0455 (US);
B60J5/0458 (EP);
B62D25/02 (EP);
B62D25/025 (EP,CN,US);
B62D25/16 (EP,CN);
B62D27/023 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] |
Former [2020/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEITENKONSTRUKTION EINER FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIE | [2020/52] | English: | VEHICLE SIDE BODY STRUCTURE | [2020/52] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CARROSSERIE LATÉRALE DE VÉHICULE | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 17.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2009173142 (MAZDA MOTOR) [X] 1,2,4,8,12 * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2011169302 (DENG ZHIBING [US], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0024] - [0032]; figures 7-8 *; | [A]DE202014105787U (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0012] - [0018]; figures 1-2 * | by applicant | JP2018118697 |