EP3708452 - INTERIOR TRIM OF A VEHICLE CAR, IN PARTICULAR OF A RAILWAY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Transport Technologies 48, rue Albert Dhalenne 93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARGENTON, Loïc 52 boulevard de la Mer 17440 Aytre / FR | 02 /
GERGAUD, Didier Félix Eugène 18 bis, rue Saint Christophe 17290 Aigrefeuille d'Aunis / FR | 03 /
YAKUBOVICH-HUGON, Tatiana 7, rue de l'Evescot 17000 La Rochelle / FR | [2021/51] |
Former [2020/43] | 01 /
LARGENTON, Loïc 52 boulevard de la Mer 17440 Aytre / FR | ||
02 /
GERGAUD, Didier, Félix, Eugène 18 bis, rue Saint Christophe 17290 Aigrefeuille d'Aunis / FR | |||
03 /
YAKUBOVICH-HUGON, Tatiana 7, rue de l'Evescot 17000 La Rochelle / FR | |||
Former [2020/38] | 01 /
LARGENTON, Loïc 13 bis, rue d'Yves 17440 Aytre / FR | ||
02 /
GERGAUD, Didier, Félix, Eugène 18 bis, rue Saint Christophe 17290 Aigrefeuille d'Aunis / FR | |||
03 /
YAKUBOVICH-HUGON, Tatiana 7, rue de l'Evescot 17000 La Rochelle / FR | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 20162637.1 | 12.03.2020 | [2020/38] | Priority number, date | FR20190002509 | 12.03.2019 Original published format: FR 1902509 | [2020/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708452 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3708452 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B61D17/10 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
B61D17/10 (EP);
Y02T30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] |
Former [2020/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INNENVERKLEIDUNG EINES WAGGONS, INSBESONDERE EINES SCHIENENFAHRZEUGS | [2020/38] | English: | INTERIOR TRIM OF A VEHICLE CAR, IN PARTICULAR OF A RAILWAY VEHICLE | [2020/38] | French: | HABILLAGE INTÉRIEUR DE VOITURE DE VÉHICULE, NOTAMMENT DE VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 14.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2020 | AL | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | DK | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | FI | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | IT | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MC | 22.12.2021 | MK | 22.12.2021 | NL | 22.12.2021 | RO | 22.12.2021 | RS | 22.12.2021 | SE | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SK | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | IE | 12.03.2022 | LU | 12.03.2022 | BG | 22.03.2022 | NO | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | PT | 22.04.2022 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 12.03.2022 | ||
LU | 12.03.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 12.03.2022 | ||
LU | 12.03.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 12.03.2022 | ||
LU | 12.03.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 12.03.2022 | ||
LU | 12.03.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 12.03.2022 | ||
LU | 12.03.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 22.12.2021 | |
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2613995 (CAREL FOUCHE IND [FR]) [A] 1-10* page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 29; figures 1-7 *; | [A]FR2692541 (ALSTHOM GEC [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 13 - page 8, line 28; figures 1-12 *; | [XI]EP1942039 (FAROEX LTD [CA]) [X] 1-4,7 * column 8, paragraph 0047 - column 15, paragraph 0080; figures 1-8 * [I] 5,6,8-10; | [XI]FR2914609 (ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,7-10 * page 4, line 31 - page 20, line 8; figures 1-13 * [I] 2,5,6; | [XI]EP3081449 (FAROEX LTD [CA]) [X] 1,3,4,7,8 * column 5, paragraph 0028 - column 7, paragraph 0040; figures 1-8 * [I] 2,5,6,9,10 |