Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021123461 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20162639 | 12.03.2020 | WO2020EP86017 | 14.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023170391 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20162639 | 12.03.2020 | WO2021EP56395 | 12.03.2021 | WO2020EP86017 | 14.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220150395 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20162639 | 12.03.2020 | WO2021EP56395 | 12.03.2021 | WO2020EP86017 | 14.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023517651 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20162639 | 12.03.2020 | WO2021EP56395 | 12.03.2021 | WO2020EP86017 | 14.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4118259 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20162639 | 12.03.2020 | WO2021EP56395 | 12.03.2021 | WO2020EP86017 | 14.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115279955 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20162639 | 12.03.2020 | WO2021EP56395 | 12.03.2021 | WO2020EP86017 | 14.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115279954 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20162639 | 12.03.2020 | WO2020EP86017 | 14.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3175060 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20162639 | 12.03.2020 | WO2021EP56395 | 12.03.2021 | WO2020EP86017 | 14.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3175051 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20162639 | 12.03.2020 | WO2020EP86017 | 14.12.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021180352 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20162639 | 12.03.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3770306 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20162639 | 12.03.2020 |