Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023293027 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318323735 | 25.05.2023 | KR20190101838 | 20.08.2019 | KR20190030174 | 15.03.2019 | US202016740591 | 13.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20200110116 | Global Dossier | 23.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20190030174 | 15.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11701009 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2023 | B2 | US2020288995 | 17.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20190101838 | 20.08.2019 | KR20190030174 | 15.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3708070 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2023 | B1 | EP3708070 | 16.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20190101838 | 20.08.2019 | KR20190030174 | 15.03.2019 |