EP3708070 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING BIO-INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Jeong Eun 504-802, 25, Yeongtong-ro 290beon-gil Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KO, Byung Hoon 1462-1901, 122 Dongtandaerosibeom-gil, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Chang Mok 8701-803, 70 Wellbeing town-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
PARK, Sang Yun 364-2303, 6-59, Dongtangongwon-ro 1-gil Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
LEE, Jong Wook 103-1502, 107, Central town-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 20162972.2 | 13.03.2020 | [2020/38] | Priority number, date | KR20190030174 | 15.03.2019 Original published format: KR 20190030174 | KR20190101838 | 20.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190101838 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708070 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3708070 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02, A61B5/021, A61B5/00, A61B5/145, // A61B5/1455 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
A61B5/02108 (EP,US);
A61B5/02007 (EP,US);
A61B5/02427 (US);
A61B5/0261 (US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (EP);
A61B5/1455 (EP,US);
A61B5/681 (EP,US);
A61B5/6843 (EP,US);
A61B5/6897 (EP,US);
A61B5/6898 (EP,US);
A61B5/7278 (EP);
A61B5/742 (EP);
A61B2560/0418 (EP);
A61B2560/0425 (EP);
A61B2562/0247 (EP);
A61B5/02028 (EP);
A61B5/6826 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] |
Former [2020/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON BIOINFORMATIONEN | [2020/38] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING BIO-INFORMATION | [2020/38] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE D'INFORMATIONS BIOLOGIQUES | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 16.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2017127958 (UNGUREANU CONSTANTIN [NL], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] *; | [XP]EP3552539 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1,4,7,10,11 * figures 1-4, 5A, 5B, 12 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0090] *; | [AP]WO2020009496 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [AP] 1-15 * figures 1-18 ** the whole document *; | [AP]KR20200005445 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [AP] 1-15 * figures 1-18 * * the whole document * | Examination | EP3818930 |