EP3689402 - METHODS FOR SECURING COMPONENTS OF A DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM DURING TRANSPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.02.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medimop Medical Projects Ltd 17 Hatidhar Street 43665 Ra'anana / IL | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cabiri, Oz 775 Nahal Natof Street 71799 Macabim / IL | 02 /
FILMAN, Reuven Y. Tevet 3 42560 Netanya / IL | 03 /
Bar-El, Yossi 536 Hazait Street 71947 Beit Arye / IL | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Durling, Barbara Eleanor Ravenhill Kilburn & Strode LLP Laapersveld 75 1213 VB Hilversum / NL | [2024/32] |
Former [2020/32] | Durling, Barbara Eleanor Ravenhill Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20163276.7 | 30.04.2014 | [2020/32] | Priority number, date | US201313874017 | 30.04.2013 Original published format: US201313874017 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689402 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3689402 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, A61M5/20, A61M5/00, A61M5/142 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
A61M5/31501 (EP);
A61M2005/2073 (EP);
A61M2005/31518 (EP);
A61M5/002 (EP);
A61M5/14248 (EP);
A61M5/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | A61M5/315, A61M5/20, A61M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] |
Former [2020/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERUNG VON KOMPONENTEN EINES ARZNEIMITTELABGABESYSTEMS WÄHREND DES TRANSPORTS | [2020/32] | English: | METHODS FOR SECURING COMPONENTS OF A DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM DURING TRANSPORT | [2020/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR FIXER DES COMPOSANTS D'UN SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS LORS DU TRANSPORT | [2020/32] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 04.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14166591.9 / EP2799099 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1003581 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]); | [X]US2004122359 (WENZ ROBERT [DE], et al); | [AD]US2009093792 (GROSS YOSSI [IL], et al); | [AD]WO2011090956 (LAMODEL LTD [IL], et al); | [A]EP2393534 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) | by applicant | US2009093792 | US2011178463 | WO2011090956 | US2013190691 |