EP3881964 - METHOD OF CONNECTING BY WELDING TWO SECTIONS OF A STRUCTURE, ESPECIALLY OF A WIND TURBINE, AND CORRESPONDING CONNECTION TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skjaerbaek, Poul Soenderupvej 5 6920 Videbaek / DK | 02 /
Soerensen, Johnny Frifeldtvej 2 6920 Videbæk / DK | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | Aspacher, Karl-Georg, et al Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20163511.7 | 17.03.2020 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3881964 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23K31/02, B23K37/02, E02B17/02, F03D13/25, F16B7/02, // B23K101/06, B23K103/04 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
B23K37/0276 (EP,US);
B23K31/02 (EP);
B23K37/0282 (EP);
E04H12/08 (EP);
E04H12/34 (EP);
F03D1/0675 (EP);
F03D13/00 (US);
B23K2101/06 (EP,US);
B23K2103/04 (EP);
E02B2017/0091 (EP);
F05B2230/232 (EP,US);
F05B2240/302 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG DURCH SCHWEISSEN VON ZWEI ABSCHNITTEN EINER STRUKTUR, INSBESONDERE EINER WINDTURBINE, UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERBINDUNGSWERKZEUG | [2021/38] | English: | METHOD OF CONNECTING BY WELDING TWO SECTIONS OF A STRUCTURE, ESPECIALLY OF A WIND TURBINE, AND CORRESPONDING CONNECTION TOOL | [2021/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE PAR SOUDAGE DE DEUX SECTIONS D'UNE STRUCTURE, EN PARTICULIER D'UNE ÉOLIENNE, ET OUTIL DE CONNEXION CORRESPONDANT | [2021/38] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/36] | 14.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]GB1537236 (WHESSOE LTD) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * page 2, line 48 - page 3, line 5; figure - * [Y] 4,11,14 [I] 3,5,7,15; | [Y]JPS58128285 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 4,11,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0001]; figure - *; | [YA]DE102010041807 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0016] - [0021]; figure - *[A] 1,9; | [XYI]KR20160056414 (DAEWOO SHIPBUILDING & MARINE [KR]) [X] 1-3,9,12,13,15 * abstract * [Y] 6 [I] 5,8 | by applicant | EP2910686 | EP3255210 |