Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3696293 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280068319 CN201280068398 CN201380060386 CN201711027219 CN201811267671 EP12798576 EP12798577 EP20163525 JP2014544939 JP2014544942

More

JP2017078065 JP2018049530 JP2018162776 KR20147017206 KR20147017209 KR20187026300 US2012067370W US2012067383W US201213690829 US201213690904 US2013043415W US201313906038 US201313906065 US201314022792 US201414445367 US201815950780 US201816128048



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014055134Global Dossier 10.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201213690904 30.11.2012
US201213690829 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013082477Global Dossier 26.09.2013A3
WO2013082477 06.06.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9013795Global Dossier 21.04.2015B2
US2015015959 15.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201414445367 29.07.2014
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201213690829 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
US201314022792 10.09.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014113083Global Dossier 24.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201213690904 30.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8817376Global Dossier 26.08.2014B2
US2014016201 16.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201213690829 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
US201314022792 10.09.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9957609Global Dossier 01.05.2018B2
US2013334031 19.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201213690904 30.11.2012
US201313906038 30.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013135741Global Dossier 30.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201213690829 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11208717Global Dossier 28.12.2021B2
US2018230589 16.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201213690904 30.11.2012
US201313906038 30.05.2013
US201815950780 11.04.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11180410Global Dossier 23.11.2021B2
US2019010083 10.01.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201313906065 30.05.2013
US201816128048 11.09.2018
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201213690904 30.11.2012
US201213690829 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10077207Global Dossier 18.09.2018B2
US2013263784 10.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201313906065 30.05.2013
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201213690904 30.11.2012
US201213690829 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20180105248Global Dossier 27.09.2018A
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
WO2012US67383 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140098178Global Dossier 07.08.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
WO2012US67370 30.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101900132BGlobal Dossier 18.09.2018B1
KR20140098176 07.08.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
WO2012US67383 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6960892BGlobal Dossier 05.11.2021B2
JP2019014649 31.01.2019A
Priority number Date
JP2017078065 11.04.2017
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6896671BGlobal Dossier 30.06.2021B2
JP2018090489 14.06.2018A
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
JP2014544939 30.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6157496BGlobal Dossier 05.07.2017B2
JP2015506895 05.03.2015A
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
WO2012US67383 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2015506893Global Dossier 05.03.2015A
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
WO2012US67370 30.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2785662Global Dossier 08.10.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
WO2012US67370 30.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2785661Global Dossier 06.05.2020B1
EP2785661 08.10.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
WO2012US67383 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109384399Global Dossier 26.02.2019A
Priority number Date
CN201280068319 30.11.2012
US201161565024 30.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107777894BGlobal Dossier 11.05.2021B
CN107777894 09.03.2018A
Priority number Date
CN201280068398 30.11.2012
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105143500BGlobal Dossier 10.10.2017B
CN105143500 09.12.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013US43415 30.05.2013
US201213690904 30.11.2012
US201213690829 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104321290Global Dossier 28.01.2015A
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
WO2012US67370 30.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104302589BGlobal Dossier 28.11.2017B
CN104302589 21.01.2015A
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
WO2012US67383 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3696293Global Dossier 19.08.2020A1
Priority number Date
EP12798577 30.11.2012
US201161565024 30.11.2011
WO2012US67383 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI588112B 21.06.2017B
TW201331143 01.08.2013A
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI680111B 21.12.2019B
TW201414688 16.04.2014A
Priority number Date
US201213690904 30.11.2012
US201213690829 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI646063B 01.01.2019B
TW201811708 01.04.2018A
Priority number Date
US201213690904 30.11.2012
US201213690829 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI706921B 11.10.2020B
TW201920041 01.06.2019A
Priority number Date
US201213690904 30.11.2012
US201213690829 30.11.2012
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013082488Global Dossier 22.08.2013A3
WO2013082488 06.06.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6397532BGlobal Dossier 26.09.2018B2
JP2017165649 21.09.2017A
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI564409B 01.01.2017B
TW201329259 16.07.2013A
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI661065B 01.06.2019B
TW201710529 16.03.2017A
Priority number Date
US201161565024 30.11.2011
US201261709423 04.10.2012
TypeType Earlier application
 EP2785661