EP3686399 - GEARED TURBOFAN WITH OVERSPEED PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2020/31] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERIDAN, William G. 38 Beal Drive Southington, CT 06489 / US | 02 /
McCUNE, Michael E. 43 Hunters Court Colchester, CT 06415 / US | [2023/39] |
Former [2020/31] | 01 /
SHERIDAN, William G. 38 Beal Drive Southington, CT Connecticut 06489 / US | ||
02 /
McCUNE, Michael E. 43 Hunters Court Colchester, CT Connecticut 06415 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 20163824.4 | 15.06.2018 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | US201715625144 | 16.06.2017 Original published format: US201715625144 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686399 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3686399 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3686399 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01D21/02, F01D21/04, F02C7/06, F02C7/36 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
F01D21/02 (EP,US);
F01D21/045 (EP,US);
F01D15/12 (US);
F01D21/04 (US);
F01D5/02 (US);
F02C7/06 (EP,US);
F02C7/36 (EP,US);
F04D25/045 (US);
F04D25/163 (US);
F04D29/041 (US);
F04D29/046 (US);
F16H1/28 (US);
F16H57/10 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2240/60 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] |
Former [2020/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GETRIEBETURBOLÜFTER MIT ÜBERDREHZAHLSCHUTZ | [2020/31] | English: | GEARED TURBOFAN WITH OVERSPEED PROTECTION | [2020/31] | French: | TURBORÉACTEUR À ENGRENAGES AVEC PROTECTION CONTRE LA SURVITESSE | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 29.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18178114.7 / EP3415726 | Divisional application(s) | EP23199878.2 / EP4276295 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2377731 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1,7,10 * page 8, line 10 - line 21 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR3022890 (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, line 1 - line 9 ** figures 2a, 2b *; | [A]EP3000989 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,5,7-10 * paragraph [0035] * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP3144487 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * paragraphs [0026] , [0042] , [0050] * * figure 3 *; | [XP]EP3296540 (ROLLS ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG [DE]) [XP] 1-3,5 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0017] * |