EP3816058 - FRESH-KEEPING PAPER BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Freshly Packaging Co., Ltd. Xinlian Village Gaoqiao Town Ningbo City, Zhejiang 315000 / CN | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAN, Chengjun Room 604, Building B, Hengwei Mansion Southern Business District Yinzhou District Ningbo City Zhejiang Province / CN | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | Patentanwälte Gierlich & Pischitzis Partnerschaft mbB Gerbermühlstraße 11 60594 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 20163844.2 | 18.03.2020 | [2021/18] | Priority number, date | CN20191144507 | 30.10.2019 Original published format: CN201911044507 | [2021/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3816058 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65D3/14, B65D3/22 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
B65D3/14 (EP,US);
A45C11/20 (CN);
B65D3/06 (US);
A45C13/02 (CN);
B31B50/74 (CN);
B65D3/22 (EP);
B65D65/40 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] |
Former [2021/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FRISCHHALTEPAPIERKASTEN | [2021/18] | English: | FRESH-KEEPING PAPER BOX | [2021/18] | French: | BOÎTE EN PAPIER DE CONSERVATION AU FRAIS | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 03.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2002043555 (MADER DURELL THOMAS [US]) [X] 1,3-8 * paragraph [0029]; figure 1 * [Y] 2 [I] 9; | [Y]EP3181472 (PTM PACKAGING TOOLS MACHINERY PTE LTD [SG]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-16 *; | [A]US5622308 (ITO SHINOBU [JP], et al) [A] 2 * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 5; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2736065 (OSWEGO FALLS CORPORATION) [A] 1 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 52; figures 1-6 * |