EP3760980 - ANGLE MEASURING EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Dr.-Johannes-Heidenhain-Str. 5 83301 Traunreut / DE | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITTERREITER, Johann Fehling 10 83339 Chieming / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 20163911.9 | 18.03.2020 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | DE201910209862 | 04.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019209862 | [2021/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3760980 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3760980 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/347, G01D5/244, G01D5/245 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G01D5/24485 (EP,US);
B23Q17/22 (CN);
G01B11/00 (CN);
G01B11/26 (CN);
G01B7/00 (CN);
G01B7/30 (CN,US);
G01D5/142 (US);
G01D5/16 (US);
G01D5/2451 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WINKELMESSEINRICHTUNG | [2021/01] | English: | ANGLE MEASURING EQUIPMENT | [2021/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE D'ANGLE | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 06.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.05.2022 | CZ | 18.05.2022 | DK | 18.05.2022 | EE | 18.05.2022 | FI | 18.05.2022 | HR | 18.05.2022 | LT | 18.05.2022 | LV | 18.05.2022 | MC | 18.05.2022 | NL | 18.05.2022 | PL | 18.05.2022 | RO | 18.05.2022 | RS | 18.05.2022 | SE | 18.05.2022 | SI | 18.05.2022 | SK | 18.05.2022 | SM | 18.05.2022 | BG | 18.08.2022 | NO | 18.08.2022 | GR | 19.08.2022 | IS | 18.09.2022 | PT | 19.09.2022 | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 18.05.2022 | |
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 18.05.2022 | |
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | FI | 18.05.2022 | |
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 18.05.2022 | |
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 18.05.2022 | |
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | FI | 18.05.2022 | |
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 18.05.2022 | |
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006043964 (WATANABE TSUKASA [JP], et al); | [A]DE102006020067 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]); | [A]EP2489988 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]); | [A]WO2018150833 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2010217167 |