EP3828804 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR RECOMMENDER MODEL SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Panda, Prasanta Tata Consultancy Services Limited Kalinga Park, SEZ Cargo. Plot No 35, Chandaka Industrial Estate, Near Infocity Patia Chandrasekharpur 751024 Bhubaneswar, Odisha / IN | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 20163991.1 | 18.03.2020 | [2021/22] | Priority number, date | IN201921048644 | 27.11.2019 Original published format: IN201921048644 | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3828804 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06, G06Q30/02 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0631 (EP);
G06F11/0706 (US);
G06F11/0766 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06Q30/0282 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] |
Former [2021/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUSWAHL VON EMPFEHLERMODELLEN | [2021/22] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR RECOMMENDER MODEL SELECTION | [2021/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR LA SÉLECTION D'UN MODÈLE DE DISPOSITIF DE RECOMMANDATION | [2021/22] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 09.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP3179434 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0042] * * figure 1; claims 1-10 *; | [I]CN109190791 (GUANGZHOU UC NETWORK TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-9* the whole document * |