EP3731033 - ADAPTIVE ANTI-WINDUP PROTECTION OF CASCADED INNER AND OUTER CONTROL LOOPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEISNER, Richard P. 185 Butler Drive Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 02 /
MUSSELMAN, Kyle C. 95 Hockanum Boulevard Unit 4706 Vernon, CT 06066 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 20164341.8 | 19.03.2020 | [2020/44] | Priority number, date | US201916395971 | 26.04.2019 Original published format: US201916395971 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3731033 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3731033 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05B5/01, G05B6/02, G05B11/42 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
G05B11/42 (EP);
G05B19/048 (US);
G05B5/01 (EP);
G05B2219/25375 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] |
Former [2020/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ADAPTIVER AUFWICKELSCHUTZ VON KASKADIERTEN INNEREN UND ÄUSSEREN REGELKREISEN | [2020/44] | English: | ADAPTIVE ANTI-WINDUP PROTECTION OF CASCADED INNER AND OUTER CONTROL LOOPS | [2020/44] | French: | PROTECTION ADAPTATIVE ANTI-ENROULEMENT DES BOUCLES DE CONTRÔLE INTERNE ET EXTERNE EN CASCADE | [2020/44] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 28.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006116783 (AGHILI FARHAD [CA], et al); | [A]US2015113996 (CAI CHAOHONG [US], et al); | [A]EP3045696 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [XI]EP3093718 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) |