Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3722059
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE102019107429 24.09.2020A1
Priority number Date
DE102019107328 21.03.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3722059Global Dossier 23.12.2020A3
EP3722059 14.10.2020A2
Priority number Date
DE102019107328 21.03.2019
DE102019107429 22.03.2019