Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11641326 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2023 | B2 | US2020412666 | 31.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916549915 | 23.08.2019 | US201962868730 | 28.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3758318 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916549915 | 23.08.2019 | US201962868730 | 28.06.2019 |