Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3757857 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3757857



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(39)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 413
10.03.2025 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
15.05.2024 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
05.04.2024 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.03.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.03.2024 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
26.03.2024 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
26.03.2024 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
01.12.2023 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.12.2023 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.12.2023 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.12.2023 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.12.2023 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 72
01.12.2023 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 72
31.10.2023 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.10.2022 Document concerning representation Search / examination 15
24.06.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.06.2021 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.06.2021 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.06.2021 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
24.06.2021 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
24.06.2021 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 10
24.06.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.01.2021 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.12.2020 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
18.09.2020 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.09.2020 European search opinion Search / examination 5
18.09.2020 European search report Search / examination 2
18.09.2020 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
13.05.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.03.2020 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
24.03.2020 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 104
20.03.2020 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.03.2020 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
20.03.2020 Claims Search / examination 2
20.03.2020 Description Search / examination 51
20.03.2020 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.03.2020 Drawings Search / examination 20
20.03.2020 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5