EP3712848 - SYSTEM FOR FORECASTING AIRCRAFT ENGINE DETERIORATION USING RECURRENT NEURAL NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2020/39] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGARAJA, Sharath B. 1210 View Road Manchester, CT Connecticut 06042 / US | 02 /
GRECO, Matthew R. 19 Mountain Side Tolland, CT Connecticut 06084 / US | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 20164888.8 | 23.03.2020 | [2020/39] | Priority number, date | US201916360480 | 21.03.2019 Original published format: US201916360480 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3712848 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3712848 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, F02C9/28, G05B13/02, G05B23/02, G06Q10/00 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
G06Q10/04 (EP,US);
B64F5/60 (US);
F02C9/28 (EP);
G05B23/024 (EP);
G05B23/0281 (US);
G05B23/0283 (EP,US);
G06F18/25 (US);
G06N3/04 (US);
G06Q10/20 (EP);
G08G5/0026 (US);
G08G5/0039 (US);
G08G5/006 (US);
H04W4/029 (US);
F05D2260/80 (EP);
F05D2260/821 (EP);
G05B13/027 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] |
Former [2020/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VORHERSAGE DER FLUGZEUGTRIEBWERKSABNUTZUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG WIEDERKEHRENDER NEURONALER NETZE | [2020/39] | English: | SYSTEM FOR FORECASTING AIRCRAFT ENGINE DETERIORATION USING RECURRENT NEURAL NETWORKS | [2020/39] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRÉVISION DE LA DÉTÉRIORATION DE MOTEUR D'AÉRONEF UTILISANT DES RÉSEAUX NEURONAUX RÉCURRENTS | [2020/39] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 23.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23217317.9 / EP4318341 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.11.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.11.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5857321 (RAJAMANI RAVI [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 4; figures 1-3 *; | [IY]EP2434127 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [I] 14,15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0046]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 1-13; | [Y]EP3260943 (BOEING CO [US]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0035] - [0065]; figures 3-5 *; | [Y]WO2018098230 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [Y] 1-13 * page 21, lines 22-26; figures 1,3; claims 15-22 ** page 22 *; | [Y]US2018307784 (STEVENS CRAIG WESLEY [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0031] - [0033] - [0044] , [0052] - [0069] - [0075] - [0082]; figures 5-8 * |