EP3885152 - USE OF N-(P-TOLUENESULFONYL)-N'-(3-P-TOLUENESULFONYLOXYPHENYL)UREA AS COLOUR DEVELOPER IN A HEAT-SENSITIVE RECORDING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koehler Innovation & Technology GmbH Hauptstraße 2-4 77704 Oberkirch / DE | [2022/18] |
Former [2021/39] | For all designated states Papierfabrik August Koehler SE Hauptstrasse 2 77704 Oberkirch / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORN, Michael Mozartstraße 14 77654 Offenburg / DE | 02 /
STALLING, Timo Renchenweg 35 77767 Appenweier / DE | 03 /
STEPPAT, Maren Ludwig-Albert-Str. 7 77704 Oberkirch / DE | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/39] | Held, Stephan Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20164949.8 | 23.03.2020 | [2021/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3885152 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3885152 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/323, B41M5/333 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
B41M5/323 (EP,KR,US);
B41M5/3333 (EP,KR,US);
B41M5/42 (US);
B41M2205/04 (US);
B41M2205/28 (US);
B41M2205/36 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON N-(P-TOLUOLSULFONYL)-N'-(3-P-TOLUOLSULFONYLFONYLOXYPHENYL) HARNSTOFF ALS FARBENTWICKLER IN EINEM WÄRMEEMPFINDLICHEN AUFZEICHNUNGSMATERIAL | [2021/39] | English: | USE OF N-(P-TOLUENESULFONYL)-N'-(3-P-TOLUENESULFONYLOXYPHENYL)UREA AS COLOUR DEVELOPER IN A HEAT-SENSITIVE RECORDING MATERIAL | [2021/39] | French: | UTILISATION DE LA N-(P-TOLUÈNESULFONYL)-N'-(3-P-TOLUÈNESULFONYLOXYPHÉNYL)URÉE COMME RÉVÉLATEUR DE COULEUR DANS UN MATÉRIAU D'ENREGISTREMENT THERMOSENSIBLE | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 25.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | DK | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | CZ | 08.06.2022 | |
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 08.06.2022 | |
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | HR | 08.06.2022 | |
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | HR | 08.06.2022 | |
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2005221982 (TAYLOR JAMES P [GB], et al); | [XY]EP3109059 (MITSUBISHI HITEC PAPER EUROPE GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP3395583 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) | by applicant | US4370370 | US4388362 | EP0600622 | JPH0720735B | DE19724647 | JP2000204123 | JP2003175671 | US6667275 | DE19806433 | EP1085069 | DE19757589 | EP2474963 | EP3219507 | JP2018167483 | JP2019162087 |