Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11822303 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2023 | B2 | US2020310374 | 01.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202019101746 | 27.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111756552B | Global Dossier | 07.05.2024 | B | CN111756552 | 09.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | DE202019101746 | 27.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3716527 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202019101746 | 27.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202019101746U | 30.06.2020 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202019101746 | 27.03.2019 |