Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
10.11.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.10.2021 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
22.10.2021 | First examination report | |
19.10.2021 | Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
12.10.2021 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
08.10.2021 | First examination report | |
08.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.11.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.08.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
14.08.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
25.03.2020 | Change - representative |