Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020087429 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715828972 | 01.12.2017 | US201916687765 | 19.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6920488B | Global Dossier | 18.08.2021 | B2 | JP2020090683 | 11.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018208511 | 06.11.2018 | US201715828972 | 01.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3708559 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18209684 | 30.11.2018 | US201715828972 | 01.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10513568 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2019 | B2 | US2019169327 | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715828972 | 01.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102275979B | Global Dossier | 12.07.2021 | B1 | KR20190065126 | 11.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715828972 | 01.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6706658B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2020 | B2 | JP2019099802 | 24.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715828972 | 01.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3492444 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2020 | B1 | EP3492444 | 05.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715828972 | 01.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109867590B | Global Dossier | 21.06.2022 | B | CN109867590 | 11.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715828972 | 01.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI690508B | 11.04.2020 | B | TW201925152 | 01.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715828972 | 01.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI803733B | 01.06.2023 | B | TW202024007 | 01.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715828972 | 01.12.2017 | Type | Earlier application | EP3492444 |