EP3708559 - METHODS OF MAKING STABLE AND THERMALLY POLYMERIZABLE VINYL, AMINO OR OLIGOMERIC PHENOXY BENZOCYCLOBUTENE MONOMERS WITH IMPROVED CURING KINETICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials LLC 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYES, Colin 455 Forest Street Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | 02 /
GALLAGHER, Michael K. 455 Forest Street Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | 03 /
RIENER, Michelle 455 Forest Street Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 20165530.5 | 30.11.2018 | [2020/38] | Priority number, date | US201715828972 | 01.12.2017 Original published format: US201715828972 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708559 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C13/44, C08F12/32, C08F12/22, // C08F212/08 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
C07C41/01 (EP,US);
C07C41/30 (KR);
C07C23/18 (US);
C07C35/31 (US);
C07C43/243 (KR);
C07C69/017 (US);
C08F12/02 (US);
C08F12/22 (EP,US);
C08F212/08 (EP,US);
C08F32/02 (US);
C08G81/025 (US);
C08K5/09 (US);
G01N25/4866 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C41/01, C07C43/243 (US,EP);
C08F212/08, C08F212/22 (US,EP);
C08F212/08, C08F212/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STABILEN UND THERMISCH POLYMERISIERBAREN VINYL-, AMINO- ODER OLIGOMEREN PHENOXY-BENZOCYCLOBUTEN-MONOMEREN MIT VERBESSERTER HÄRTUNGSKINETIK | [2020/38] | English: | METHODS OF MAKING STABLE AND THERMALLY POLYMERIZABLE VINYL, AMINO OR OLIGOMERIC PHENOXY BENZOCYCLOBUTENE MONOMERS WITH IMPROVED CURING KINETICS | [2020/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE MONOMÈRES VINYLIQUES, AMINO OU OLIGOMÉRIQUES DE PHÉNOXY BENZOCYCLOBUTÈNE STABLES ET THERMIQUEMENT POLYMÉRISABLES AYANT UNE CINÉTIQUE DE DURCISSEMENT AMÉLIORÉE | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 05.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18209684.2 / EP3492444 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4783514 (KIRCHHOFF ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * Preparation 7; column 17 *; | [A]CN101226786 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH [CN]) [A] 1-10 * example - *; | [A]US2015184017 (HUSTAD PHILLIP D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 6; compounds I-10, M-25, M-26, M-27 *; | [A]US2015210793 (PARK JONG KEUN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057] *; | [A]WO2017031622 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 19; example 1 * * claim 2 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Maleimidocyclobutarene monomers", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, KENNETH MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, UK, GB, (19920801), vol. 340, no. 118, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007118071 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | - HARTH et al., "Synthesis of low-temperature cross-linker and utilization", Polymer Chemistry, (20120000), vol. 3, no. 4, doi:10.1039/c2py00606e, pages 857 - 860, XP055224108 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c2py00606e | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 905459-27-0 |