EP3885677 - AUTONOMOUS REFRIGERATING/FREEZING UNIT WITH SUPPLY DC OR AC VOLTAGE POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GV Consultancy Grabarouk, Viktor Ul Sdadowa 14 21-500 Biala Podlaska / PL | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRABAROUK, Viktor F. Ruschica St. 4 220 114 Minsk 220 114 Minsk / BY | 02 /
ZHUKOUSKI, Dzmitry Pushkina Avenue 67, flat 26 220 073 Minsk / BY | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Felber, Josef Felber & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 116 8008 Zürich / CH | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 20165718.6 | 25.03.2020 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3885677 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F25D11/00, F25B27/00 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
F25D11/006 (EP);
F25D19/02 (EP);
F25D2303/0832 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTONOME KÜHL-/GEFRIEREINHEIT MIT GLEICH- ODER WECHSELSPANNUNGSVERSORGUNG | [2021/39] | English: | AUTONOMOUS REFRIGERATING/FREEZING UNIT WITH SUPPLY DC OR AC VOLTAGE POWER SUPPLY | [2021/39] | French: | UNITÉ DE RÉFRIGÉRATION/CONGÉLATION AUTONOME AVEC ALIMENTATION EN TENSION CONTINUE OU ALTERNATIVE | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/36] | 21.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2575859 (B MEDICAL SYSTEMS SARL [LU]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0028] - [0030]; figure - *; | [X]US2018094846 (KOELSCH RONALD [US]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0019] - [0027]; figure - *; | [X]WO2016181223 (3RD STONE DESIGN INC) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0023] , [0027] , [0042]; figure - *; | [X]WO2018005988 (EMERSON CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0091] , [0092]; figure - *; | [XI]WO2005090881 (DRYZUN NATHAN [AU], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-7 |