EP3758295 - RULES DRIVEN SOFTWARE DEPLOYMENT AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juniper Networks, Inc. 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIDAY, Robert J. c/o Juniper Networks, Inc. 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA California 94089 / US | 02 /
LUOH, Keh-Ming c/o Juniper Networks, Inc. 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA California 94089 / US | 03 /
FREI, Randall Wayne c/o Juniper Networks, Inc. 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA California 94089 / US | 04 /
SAROOD, Osman 5712 Park Manor Dr San Jose, ca California 95118 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20165756.6 | 26.03.2020 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US201962865251P | 23.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962865251 P | US201916728464 | 27.12.2019 Original published format: US201916728464 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758295 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/26, G06F8/65, H04L29/08 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
H04L43/0817 (EP,US);
H04L41/082 (EP,CN,US);
G06F11/1433 (EP);
G06F11/302 (EP);
G06F11/3055 (EP);
G06F11/3409 (EP);
G06F11/3495 (EP);
G06F8/65 (EP,US);
H04L41/044 (EP);
H04L41/046 (EP,CN);
H04L41/0813 (CN);
H04L41/0863 (EP);
H04L41/0894 (EP,CN);
H04L41/28 (EP,CN);
H04L43/08 (EP,CN);
H04L43/12 (US);
H04L43/16 (CN);
H04L63/02 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGELGESTEUERTER AGENT ZUR SOFTWARE-ANWENDUNG | [2021/01] | English: | RULES DRIVEN SOFTWARE DEPLOYMENT AGENT | [2021/01] | French: | AGENT DE DÉPLOIEMENT LOGICIEL SUR LA BASE DE RÈGLES | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 29.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008281956 (MADEJ PIOTR [CA]) [I] 1,3-5,8,10-12,15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0069]; figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]US2014244799 (KUNDGOL MOHAMMED ASIF N [IN], et al) [A] 2-5,9-12 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0069]; figures 4-7 *; | [I]US9311066 (GARMAN MATTHEW S [US], et al) [I] 1,6-8,13-15 * column 5, line 39 - column 18, line 3; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2019034194 (FOX ZOHAR [IL]) [A] 7,14* paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0160]; figures 1A, 1B,10-18 *; | [I]US2019138295 (AGERSTAM MATS [US], et al) [I] 1,2,8,9,15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0066]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0113]; figure 20A * |