EP3731523 - IMAGE COMPRESSION USING IMAGE ACQUISITION DEVICE CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dotphoton AG Nordstrasse 3 6300 Zug / CH | [2021/25] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states Dotphoton AG Zeughausgasse 17 6300 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanguinetti, Bruno Hasenbüelweg 7 6300 Zug / CH | 02 /
Clausen, Christoph Musikerweg 15 2440 Gramatneusiedl / AT | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Sammer, Thomas per Mens Intellectual Property Consulting Sàrl Rue Agasse 54 1208 Genève / CH | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 20166138.6 | 27.03.2020 | [2020/44] | Priority number, date | US201962827882P | 02.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962827882 P | US202016831359 | 26.03.2020 Original published format: US202016831359 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3731523 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3731523 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/124 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
H04N19/124 (EP);
G06T9/00 (US);
G06T7/0002 (US);
G06T7/80 (US);
H04N19/136 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] |
Former [2020/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPRIMIERUNG VON BILDDATEN UNTER NUTZUNG VON MERKMALEN DER BILDAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/44] | English: | IMAGE COMPRESSION USING IMAGE ACQUISITION DEVICE CHARACTERISTICS | [2020/44] | French: | COMPRESSION DES DONNÉES D'IMAGE EN UTILISANT DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES DU DISPOSITIF D'ACQUISITION D'IMAGE | [2020/44] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 23.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6018362 (SUZUKI MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [XY]JP2003179926 (NIKON CORP); | [A]US2014101485 (WEGENER ALBERT W [US]); | [ID]US10063891 (MARTIN ANTHONY [FR], et al); | by applicant | US6031939 | US10063891 |