EP3718778 - INKJET RECORDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 SHIMOMARUKO 3-CHOME OHTA-KU Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Yusuke c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
SHIMADA, Koki c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
KOMORI, Masateru c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 04 /
ARAKI, Yuta c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Canon Europe Limited European Intellectual Property Group 4 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Canon Europe Limited European Intellectual Property Group 3 The Square, Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 20167045.2 | 31.03.2020 | [2020/41] | Priority number, date | JP20190072549 | 05.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019072549 | JP20190072550 | 05.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019072550 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718778 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J2/17, B41J2/165, B41J29/02, B41J29/13 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
B41J29/02 (EP);
B41J2/175 (EP,BR);
B41J2/21 (BR,CN);
B41J25/006 (US);
B41J2/01 (BR);
B41J2/145 (CN);
B41J2/16508 (US);
B41J2/16517 (EP);
B41J2/16535 (US);
B41J2/1714 (EP,BR);
B41J2/17509 (EP);
B41J2/17513 (EP,BR);
B41J2/1752 (EP,BR,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,BR);
B41J2/17536 (EP);
B41J2/17543 (EP);
B41J2/17546 (EP);
B41J2/17553 (EP,BR);
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | B41J29/02, B41J2/175, B41J29/13, B41J2/165, B41J2/17, B41J25/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] |
Former [2020/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/41] | English: | INKJET RECORDING APPARATUS | [2020/41] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENREGISTREMENT PAR JET D'ENCRE | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 07.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6244683 (ALVAREZ JOSE [ES], et al) [X] 1,7,8,11,13-15 * column 9, line 9 - line 33; figures 1-12 * [I] 2-6,9,10,12; | [I]JP2006326912 (CANON KK) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0024]; figures 1-9 *; | [I]US2007279464 (HARAZIM EUGEN [DE]) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-14 *; | [A]US9387681 (SOMANO TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* column 7, line 9 - line 13 * | by applicant | JPH0976537 |