EP3753706 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CREATING A GAS STREAM DURING THE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING OF A PRODUCT IN A POWDER BED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Common Sense Engineering and Consult B.V.B.A. Mastbos 26 2440 Geel / BE | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mercelis, Peter Common Sense Engineering and Consult B.V.B.A. Mastbos 26 2240 Geel / BE | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Callewaert, Koen, et al Bureau Callewaert b.v.b.a. Brusselsesteenweg 108 3090 Overijse / BE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 20167447.0 | 31.03.2020 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | BE20190005291 | 02.05.2019 Original published format: BE 201905291 | [2020/52] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3753706 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3753706 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/153, B29C64/371, B29C64/245, B22F10/322, B22F3/105, B22F12/17, B22F12/30, B22F12/70, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
B29C64/364 (US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F10/322 (EP,US);
B22F12/17 (EP);
B22F12/30 (EP);
B22F12/70 (EP,US);
B29C64/245 (EP,US);
B29C64/371 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F12/30, B22F5/106 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | B29C64/153, B22F3/105, B29C64/371, B29C64/245 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] |
Former [2020/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES GASSTROMS WÄHREND DER ADDITIVEN HERSTELLUNG EINES PRODUKTS IN EINEM PULVERBETT | [2020/52] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CREATING A GAS STREAM DURING THE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING OF A PRODUCT IN A POWDER BED | [2020/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CRÉATION D'UN FLUX DE GAZ PENDANT LA FABRICATION ADDITIVE D'UN PRODUIT DANS UN LIT DE POUDRE | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 23.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 23.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.01.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.02.2023 | CZ | 22.02.2023 | DK | 22.02.2023 | EE | 22.02.2023 | ES | 22.02.2023 | FI | 22.02.2023 | HR | 22.02.2023 | IT | 22.02.2023 | LT | 22.02.2023 | LV | 22.02.2023 | MC | 22.02.2023 | PL | 22.02.2023 | RO | 22.02.2023 | RS | 22.02.2023 | SE | 22.02.2023 | SI | 22.02.2023 | SK | 22.02.2023 | SM | 22.02.2023 | IE | 31.03.2023 | LU | 31.03.2023 | NO | 22.05.2023 | GR | 23.05.2023 | IS | 22.06.2023 | PT | 22.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
IE | 31.03.2023 | ||
LU | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
IE | 31.03.2023 | ||
LU | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19952998 (EXNER HORST [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0092] * * figure 3 *; | [A]WO2014165265 (DUDLEY KURT) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0012] * * figures 6,7 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0100] * * claim - * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0050] *; | [A]DE102014217786 (EOS ELECTRO OPTICAL SYST [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] *; | [A]DE102015109849 (ACONITY3D GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0052] * * claim - ** paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0079] * | Examination | DE19952998 |