EP3722156 - CLIP ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation 40531 Göteborg / SE | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENBERG, Johan Hermanslustvägen 4 443 32 LERUM / SE | 02 /
RUTELIN, Sebastian Älvsborgsgatan 23B 414 72 GÖTEBORG / SE | [2021/29] |
Former [2020/42] | 01 /
ROSENBERG, Johan Hermanslustvägen 4 443 32 LERUM / SE | ||
02 /
RUTGERSSON, Sebastian Älvsborgsgatan 23B 414 72 GÖTEBORG / SE | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 20167689.7 | 02.04.2020 | [2020/42] | Priority number, date | US201916377306 | 08.04.2019 Original published format: US201916377306 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722156 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3722156 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/00, F16B21/08, F16B2/24, F16B5/06, F16B5/12 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
B60R11/00 (EP);
B62D65/026 (CN);
F16B5/0664 (US);
B60S5/00 (CN);
F16B21/06 (US);
F16B21/086 (EP);
F16B5/0614 (EP);
F16B5/123 (EP);
B60R2011/0059 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLAMMERANORDNUNG | [2023/25] | English: | CLIP ASSEMBLY | [2020/42] | French: | ENSEMBLE PINCE | [2023/25] |
Former [2020/42] | CLIP-ANORDNUNG ZUM HALTEN EINER KOMPONENTE WÄHREND EINES FAHRZEUGMONTAGE-/-DEMONTAGEPROZESSES | ||
Former [2020/42] | ENSEMBLE PINCES POUR MAINTENIR UN COMPOSANT LORS D'UN PROCESSUS DE MONTAGE/DÉMONTAGE D'UN VÉHICULE | Examination procedure | 12.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 14.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19714356 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XY]EP1493653 (KASAI KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-13,15 * the whole document * [Y] 6,14; | [A]DE102009033129 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 6,14 * paragraph [0022]; figure 3 *; | [A]DE102013011527 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2017004322 (PENN ENG & MFG CORP [US]) [Y] 6,14 * the whole document * | Examination | US3959852 | DE102011016647 | US9644653 | CN108930697 |