EP3696536 - A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SUBSTRATE AND THE USE OF SUCH A SUBSTRATE TO ANALYZE BIOMOLECULES CAPABLE OF GENERATING LIGHT EMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/34] | A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SUBSTRATE AND A METHOD OF ANALYZING BIOMOLECULES CAPABLE OF GENERATING LIGHT EMISSIONS | ||
[2024/09] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina, Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2020/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWEN, M. Shane Illumina 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 02 /
YUAN, Dajun Illumina 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/34] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20167966.9 | 14.04.2016 | [2020/34] | Priority number, date | US201562147440P | 14.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562147440 P | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3696536 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, C12Q1/6816, C12Q1/6818, C12Q1/6874, G03F7/00, // G01N21/05, G01N21/76, B82Y20/00, B82Y40/00 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6816 (EP,CN,US);
G01N21/76 (EP,CN,US);
C12N15/1093 (US);
B81C1/00031 (CN);
B82Y15/00 (CN,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,CN,US);
B82Y30/00 (CN,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/6818 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/6869 (CN,US);
C12Q1/6874 (EP,CN,US);
G01N21/05 (EP,CN,US);
G01N21/6452 (EP,CN,US);
G01N21/6456 (EP,CN,US);
G01N21/648 (EP,CN,US);
G01N21/6486 (CN,US);
G03F7/0002 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00317 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2565/607, C12Q2565/628 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6818, C12Q2565/607, C12Q2565/628 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/607, C12Q2565/628 (CN);
C12Q1/6874, C12Q2565/607, C12Q2565/628 (US,CN,EP) |
Former IPC [2020/34] | G01N21/64, C12Q1/6874, B81C1/00, B82Y30/00, B82Y40/00, B82Y20/00, G03F7/00, B82Y15/00, C12Q1/6816, C12Q1/6818, // G01N21/76, G01N21/05 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] |
Former [2020/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SUBSTRATS UND VERWENDUNG EINES SOLCHEN SUBSTRATS ZUR ANALYSE VON BIOMOLEKÜLEN DIE LICHTEMISSIONEN ERZEUGEN KÖNNEN | [2024/09] | English: | A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SUBSTRATE AND THE USE OF SUCH A SUBSTRATE TO ANALYZE BIOMOLECULES CAPABLE OF GENERATING LIGHT EMISSIONS | [2024/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SUBSTRAT ET UTILISATION D'UN TEL SUBSTRAT POUR ANALYSER DES BIOMOLÉCULES CAPABLES DE GÉNÉRER DES ÉMISSIONS LUMINEUSES | [2024/09] |
Former [2020/34] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SUBSTRATS UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON BIOMOLEKÜLEN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON LICHTEMISSIONEN | ||
Former [2020/34] | A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SUBSTRATE AND A METHOD OF ANALYZING BIOMOLECULES CAPABLE OF GENERATING LIGHT EMISSIONS | ||
Former [2020/34] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SUBSTRAT ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DE BIOMOLÉCULES APTES À GÉNÉRER DES ÉMISSIONS DE LUMIÈRE | Examination procedure | 18.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 18.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16723559.7 / EP3283870 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US7022288 (BOSS PAMELA [US]) [X] 1,8,11 * figures 4,5,12,17 * [Y] 7,10; | [XI]US2008240543 (BUDACH WOLFGANG ERNST GUSTAV [DE], et al) [X] 12,14,15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 19] - [0023] - [0090] , [0129]; figures 1-3 * [I] 13; | [XY]US2008297802 (OGAWA MIKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,11 * paragraphs [0043] , [0 45] , [0 52] , [0 55] - [0057] - [0 73] - [0074]; figures 1A,2B,2C,4A,4B,5A-5D * [Y] 7,10; | [A]US2013260479 (CHOU CHIEN [TW], et al) [A] 12-15 * paragraphs [0035] - [0037]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2014154668 (CHOU STEPHEN Y [US], et al) [A] 12-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0010] , [0032] , [0047] , [0063] - [0068] - [0086] - [0088] - [0094] - [0098] - [0139]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2014121156 (SOLAN LLC [US], et al) [Y] 7,10* paragraphs [0076] - [0077] - [0085]; figure 5D *; | [A]US2014243224 (BARNARD STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0020] , [0054] , [0056]; figure 1 *; | [AP]WO2015100373 (ILLUMINA INC [US]) [AP] 12-15 * the whole document * * figures 19C,19D; claims 14,65-167 *; | [L] - US 61/920,244, M Shane Bowen: ENHANCING DNA CLUSTER FLUORESCENCE USING LOCALIZED SURFACE PLASMON RESONANCE, XP055287969 [L] 12-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO8910977 | WO9106678 | US5599675 | US5750341 | US6210891 | US6258568 | US6274320 | US6355431 | WO2004018497 | US2005053980 | US6890741 | US6913884 | WO2005065814 | US2005181440 | US2005191698 | US2005244870 | US7057026 | US7211414 | US7244559 | WO2007123744 | US7315019 | US7329492 | US2008108082 | US7405281 | US2009186349 | US7582420 | US7595883 | US2009272914 | US2010111768 | US7785790 | US2011059865 | US8039817 | US2011312529 | US2012270305 | US2012316086 | US2013261028 | US2014079923 | US2014242334 | US8895249 | - GASPAR et al., Scientific Reports, (20130000), vol. 3, page 1469 | - RYBENKOV et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19930000), vol. 90, pages 5307 - 5311 | - ZIMMERMAN et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, pages 599 - 620 | - SOBEL et al., Biopolymers, (19910000), vol. 31, pages 1559 - 1564 | - LUCAS et al., "Nanoimprint Lithography Based Approach for the Fabrication of Large-Area, Uniformly Oriented Plasmonic Arrays", Adv. Mater., (20080000), vol. 20, pages 1129 - 1134 | - BENTLEY et al., Nature, (20080000), vol. 456, pages 53 - 59 | - RONAGHI et al., Analytical Biochemistry, (19960000), vol. 242, no. 1, pages 84 - 9 | - RONAGHI, Genome Res., (20010000), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 3 - 11 | - RONAGHI et al., Science, (19980000), vol. 281, no. 5375, page 363 | - SHENDURE et al., Science, (20050000), vol. 309, pages 1728 - 1732 | - BAINS et al., Journal of Theoretical Biology, (19880000), vol. 135, no. 3, pages 303 - 7 | - DRMANAC et al., Nature Biotechnology, (19980000), vol. 16, pages 54 - 58 | - FODOR et al., Science, (19950000), vol. 251, no. 4995, pages 767 - 773 | - LEVENE et al., Science, (20030000), vol. 299, pages 682 - 686 | - LUNDQUIST et al., Opt. Lett., (20080000), vol. 33, pages 1026 - 1028 | - KORLACH et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20080000), vol. 105, pages 1176 - 1181 | US19750619142 | US19330617538 | US19840615786 | US20140615407 | WO2011US57111 | WO2014US69373 | WO2014US72256 |