EP3760298 - FILTER CARTRIDGE FOR AN AIR CLEANER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Donaldson Company, Inc. 1400 West 94th Street Bloomington, MN 55431 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campbell, Steven c/o Donaldson Company, Inc. MINNEAPOLIS, MN 55440-1299 / US | 02 /
Gieseke, Steven Scott 6239 Third Avenue South RICHFIELD, 55423 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 20168206.9 | 27.06.2014 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US201361841005P | 28.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361841005 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3760298 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/52 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
B01D46/525 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/52 (RU);
B01D46/0005 (CN,KR,US);
B01D46/521 (CN);
B01D46/009 (KR,US);
B01D46/10 (KR,US);
B01D46/527 (KR,US);
B01D2201/342 (KR,US);
B01D2201/4046 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FILTERPATRONE FÜR LUFTFILTERANORDNUNG | [2021/01] | English: | FILTER CARTRIDGE FOR AN AIR CLEANER ASSEMBLY | [2021/01] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE FILTRE POUR UN ENSEMBLE DE PURIFICATEUR D'AIR | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 06.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14742659.7 / EP3013456 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2140922 (BALDWIN FILTERS INC [US]) [I] 1-13 * figures 1-24 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0038] - [0044] - [0051] - [0056] *; | [X]US2010186353 (ACKERMANN STEFFEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * figures 1-13 ** paragraphs [0034] - [0071] *; | [I]US2010258493 (KINDKEPPEL CARYN J [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * figures 1-15 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0028] * | by applicant | US396098 | US398046 | US399944 | US428128 | US437401 | US4925561 | US5049326 | US5562825 | US5613992 | WO9740918 | US5772883 | US5792247 | US5820646 | US5895574 | US5902364 | US6039778 | US6179890 | US6190432 | US6210469 | US6235195 | US6350296 | WO03047722 | US6673136 | WO2004007054 | WO2004082795 | US2004187689 | US2005130508 | WO2005077487 | US2008282890 | US2009127211 | US7625419 | US2010032365 | DE202008017059U | US20210604675 | US19550604572 | US20030731564 | WO2004US07927 | US20040605438 | US20070731504 | US20080012785 | US20080215718 | US20090537069 |