EP3892965 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING OR MEASURING A FLOW OF A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krick Messtechnik & Partner GmbH & Co. KG Am Bahnhof 6a 63505 Langenselbold / DE | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRICK, Herbert Krick Messtechnik & Partner GmbH & Co. KG Am Bahnhof 6a 63505 Langenselbold / DE | 02 /
HOFMANN, Jürgen Krick Messtechnik & Partner GmbH & Co. KG Am Bahnhof 6a 63505 Langenselbold / DE | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Schultheiss & Sterzel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Berner Straße 52 60437 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 20168242.4 | 06.04.2020 | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892965 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/684, G01F1/696 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
G01F1/6842 (EP);
G01F1/696 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG ODER MESSUNG EINES FLUIDSTROMS | [2021/41] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING OR MEASURING A FLOW OF A FLUID | [2021/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION OU DE MESURE D'UN FLUX DE FLUIDE | [2021/41] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2020 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 14.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 11.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE3914216 (SCHLEICHER RELAIS [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8,12,15 * claims 1,9 * * figures 1,2a-b * * column 2, line 10 - line 15 * [I] 4,5,7,9-11,13,14; | [A]EP1148317 (POSTBERG HANS JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 9,14 * figure 6 *; | [A]WO2014142806 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 13 * claims 1-2 * | by applicant | DE102010018948 | JP2019027823 | DE202005008774U |