EP3722565 - AFTER-FAN SYSTEM FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2020/42] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIDELKOVSKIY, Dmitriy B 115 West Rd. Apt. 2904 Ellington, CT 06029 / US | 02 /
CHAKKA, Pitchaiah Vijay 79 Fox Hollow Avon, CT 06001 / US | 03 /
WINTER, Michael 41 Byron Place New Haven, CT 06515 / US | 04 /
KUPRATIS, Daniel Bernard 12 Sunset Drive Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 20168376.0 | 07.04.2020 | [2020/42] | Priority number, date | US201962831953P | 10.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962831953 P | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722565 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/16, F02K3/02, F02C9/20, F02K3/04 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
F02K3/04 (EP);
F02K3/06 (US);
F01D17/162 (EP,US);
F02C9/20 (EP);
F04D29/323 (US);
F02C7/36 (US);
F05D2220/323 (US);
F05D2220/36 (US);
F05D2240/12 (US);
F05D2240/35 (US);
F05D2260/40311 (US);
F05D2260/74 (US);
F05D2260/79 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÜFTERNACHGESTELLTES SYSTEM FÜR EIN GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK | [2020/42] | English: | AFTER-FAN SYSTEM FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2020/42] | French: | SYSTÈME POST-VENTILATEUR POUR UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 14.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0022692 (SNECMA [FR]); | [XY]US5261227 (GIFFIN III ROLLIN G [US]); | [A]US2009145106 (KEOGH RORY [US]); | [Y]WO2011038216 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al); | [X]EP2587026 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [A]WO2014152875 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) |