EP3722529 - ROOFING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoffmann, Walter Schwalbenweg 16a 65527 Niedernhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | For all designated states Hoffmann, Walter Schwlbenweg 16a 65527 Niedernhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | 01 /
Hoffmann, Walter Schwalbenweg 16a 65527 Niedernhausen / DE | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 20168526.0 | 07.04.2020 | [2020/42] | Priority number, date | DE201910109243 | 09.04.2019 Original published format: DE102019109243 | [2020/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722529 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04D3/08 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
E04D3/08 (EP);
E04D2003/0868 (EP);
E04D2003/0875 (EP);
E04D2003/0881 (EP);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERDACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/42] | English: | ROOFING SYSTEM | [2020/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TOITURE | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 29.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE202016005196U (KNEER INGO [DE]) [X] 1-7 * figures 1,4-5,10-11,19-22 * * paragraphs [0072] , [0091] - [0093] - [0099] , [0142] , [0180] *; | [X]EP2607567 (ERHARDT MARKISENBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * figures 4,6 * |