EP3892467 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING SHEET METAL TO STACKS OF METAL SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2022 [2022/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states voestalpine Automotive Components Dettingen GmbH & Co. KG Daimlerstraße 29 72581 Dettingen an der Erms / DE | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lanksweirt, Jochen Krokusweg 21 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 02 /
Bursy, Heinrich Zapfenäckerstraße 16 73268 Erkenbrechtsweiler / DE | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Jell, Friedrich Bismarckstrasse 9 4020 Linz / AT | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 20168583.1 | 07.04.2020 | [2021/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892467 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B32B37/26, B32B38/04, H02K15/02, B32B37/12 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
B32B38/04 (EP,KR);
B32B37/1207 (KR);
H02K15/02 (EP,KR,US);
B32B37/12 (EP);
B32B37/26 (EP,KR);
H01F41/0233 (EP,KR);
B21D28/02 (EP,KR);
B32B2037/1215 (KR);
B32B2037/262 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON BLECHTEILEN ZU BLECHPAKETEN | [2021/41] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING SHEET METAL TO STACKS OF METAL SHEETS | [2021/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE DE PIÈCES EN TÔLE EN PAQUETS DE TÔLE | [2021/41] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Observations by third parties | 14.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/40] | 23.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2014089593 (VOESTALPINE STAHL GMBH [AT]); | [A]EP2883692 (STAMPTEC HOLDING GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE102017001802 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [A]EP3373419 (VOESTALPINE AUTOMOTIVE COMPONENTS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | WO2014089593 | other | EP2450189 | EP2826136 |