EP3769983 - WORK VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/04] | CAB MOUNTING | ||
[2022/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Tractor S.A.S. 7, Rue Dewoitine 78141 Vélizy-Villacoublay Cedex / FR | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Bot, Emeric 15 rue l'Orient 78000 Versailles / FR | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | CLAAS Gruppe Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 20169541.8 | 15.04.2020 | [2021/04] | Priority number, date | DE201910120011 | 24.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019120011 | [2021/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3769983 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3769983 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60G99/00, B62D33/06, F16F1/00 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
B60G99/002 (EP);
B62D33/0608 (EP);
B60G2204/162 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] |
Former [2021/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2022/49] | English: | WORK VEHICLE | [2022/49] | French: | VÉHICULE DE TRAVAIL | [2022/49] |
Former [2021/04] | KABINENLAGERUNG | ||
Former [2021/04] | CAB MOUNTING | ||
Former [2021/04] | SUSPENSION DE CABINE | Examination procedure | 26.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 27.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | ES | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | IT | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | MC | 29.03.2023 | NL | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SI | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | IE | 15.04.2023 | LU | 15.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 29.03.2023 | |
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
IE | 15.04.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 29.03.2023 | |
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
IE | 15.04.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 29.03.2023 | |
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 29.03.2023 | |
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | EE | 29.03.2023 | |
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | EE | 29.03.2023 | |
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | EE | 29.03.2023 | |
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 29.03.2023 | |
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 29.03.2023 | |
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR372726 (ALFRED BELVALETTE [FR]) [X] 1-7,11-13 * figures 1-4 *[I] 10; | [XDI]DE102005030746 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [XD] 1,6,10-13 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [ 0028] - [0031] * [I] 7; | [XI]DE102009026503 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,8-13 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0052] * [I] 3-5,7; | [XI]EP2803514 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1-4,6,10-13 * abstract * * figures 1, 3 * * paragraph [0016] * [I] 5,7 | Examination | US6619533 | by applicant | DE102005030746 |