EP3771601 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A BRAKE SYSTEM OF AN AGRICULTURAL TRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Tractor S.A.S. 7, Rue Dewoitine 78141 Vélizy-Villacoublay Cedex / FR | [2021/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roger, Fabien 6, rue Léon Giraud 75019 Paris / FR | [2021/05] | Representative(s) | CLAAS Gruppe Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2021/05] | Application number, filing date | 20169557.4 | 15.04.2020 | [2021/05] | Priority number, date | DE201910120958 | 02.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019120958 | [2021/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3771601 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3771601 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/20, B60T8/17, B60T8/32 | [2021/05] | CPC: |
B60T7/20 (EP);
B60T8/1708 (EP);
B60T8/1887 (EP);
B60T8/323 (EP);
B60T2220/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] |
Former [2021/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES BREMSSYSTEMS EINES LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN ZUGES | [2021/05] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A BRAKE SYSTEM OF AN AGRICULTURAL TRAIN | [2021/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE D'UN TRAIN AGRICOLE | [2021/05] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 03.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.12.2023
07.12.2023
ADMISSIBLE ZF Friedrichshafen AG Löwentaler Strasse 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2024/02] | 20.12.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.04.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.03.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | ES | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | IT | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | IE | 15.04.2023 | LU | 15.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 08.03.2023 | |
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
IE | 15.04.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 08.03.2023 | |
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 08.03.2023 | |
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | CZ | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 08.03.2023 | |
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4429231 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [XI]EP3009312 (DEERE & CO [US]); | [A]DE102017011802 (WABCO EUROPE BVBA [BE]) | by applicant | DE19519768 | DE102013007881 | Opposition | DE10359039 | DE69833307T | JP2007163157 | DE102006054703 | DE102006036748 | DE102009031851 | WO2013004315 | WO2013004314 | DE102015006737 | DE102015012378 | DE102016104453 | DE102017202820 | EP2934964 |