EP3744306 - SPA CABINET ATTACHMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bullfrog International, L.C. 668 West 14600 South Bluffdale, UT 84065 / US | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCLANE, Mark 217 West 2125 North Lehi, UT 84043 / US | 02 /
HALES, Eric 9217 Mount Airey Drive Eagle Mountain, UT 84005 / US | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/49] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20170516.7 | 26.01.2016 | [2020/49] | Priority number, date | US201514606232 | 27.01.2015 Original published format: US201514606232 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744306 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3744306 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61H33/00, A47K3/16, A47K3/162, E04H4/00 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
A61H33/6005 (EP,US);
A47B47/0075 (US);
A47B81/00 (US);
A47B95/00 (US);
A47B96/00 (US);
E04H4/0031 (EP,US);
E04H4/0043 (EP,US);
A47B2220/03 (US);
A47K3/161 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] |
Former [2020/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPA-SCHRANKBEFESTIGUNG | [2023/46] | English: | SPA CABINET ATTACHMENT | [2020/49] | French: | FIXATION POUR MEUBLE DE SPA | [2023/46] |
Former [2020/49] | SPA-SEITENTEILBEFESTIGUNG | ||
Former [2020/49] | FIXATION D'ARMOIRE DE SPA | Examination procedure | 28.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 28.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16152834.4 / EP3050552 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3509458 (PAULI WILLI, et al); | [I]DE3704292 (KALDEWEI FRANZ GMBH & CO); | [Y]US5466058 (CHAN SHIU C [US]); | [Y]US6021613 (REUTER ROBERT E [US], et al); | [XI]US6148450 (NICHOLAS VALENTINE J [US]); | [I]NZ625910 (WATKINS MFG CORP) | by applicant | US8881321 |