EP3734254 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING WATER SOLUBLE PROTEIN CONTENT (WSPC) IN SOYBEAN BY NEAR INFRARED SPECTROSCOPY (NIRS) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institute of Crop Sciences, Chinese Academy of Agricultural Sciences 12 South Street Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100081 / CN | For all designated states Yangtze University No. 1, Nanhuan Road Jingzhou, Hubei 434023 / CN | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIU, Lijuan No.12 Zhongguancun South St., Haidian District Beijing, P.R.China BEIJING / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jun No.12 Zhongguancun South St., Haidian District Beijing, P.R.China BEIJING / CN | 03 /
XU, Ruixin No.12 Zhongguancun South St., Haidian District BEIJING / CN | 04 /
SONG, Jian No.12 Zhongguancun South St., Haidian District BEIJING / CN | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 29bis, rue d' Astorg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2020/45] | Hirsch & Associés 137, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20170982.1 | 23.04.2020 | [2020/45] | Priority number, date | CN201910339010 | 25.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910339010 | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734254 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3734254 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/35, G01N33/02 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
G01N21/3563 (EP,CN);
G01N21/359 (EP,CN);
G01N33/02 (EP);
G01N2001/2866 (EP);
G01N2001/386 (EP);
G01N2001/4083 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES GEHALTS AN WASSERLÖSLICHEN PROTEINEN (WSPC) IN SOJABOHNEN DURCH NAHINFRAROTSPEKTROSKOPIE (NIRS) | [2020/45] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING WATER SOLUBLE PROTEIN CONTENT (WSPC) IN SOYBEAN BY NEAR INFRARED SPECTROSCOPY (NIRS) | [2020/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UN CONTENU DE PROTÉINES SOLUBLES DANS L'EAU (WSPC) DANS DES GRAINES DE SOJA PAR SPECTROSCOPIE INFRAROUGE PROCHE (NIRS) | [2020/45] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 06.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.06.2022 | AT | 22.06.2022 | CZ | 22.06.2022 | DK | 22.06.2022 | EE | 22.06.2022 | ES | 22.06.2022 | FI | 22.06.2022 | HR | 22.06.2022 | IT | 22.06.2022 | LT | 22.06.2022 | LV | 22.06.2022 | MC | 22.06.2022 | NL | 22.06.2022 | PL | 22.06.2022 | RO | 22.06.2022 | RS | 22.06.2022 | SE | 22.06.2022 | SI | 22.06.2022 | SK | 22.06.2022 | SM | 22.06.2022 | BG | 22.09.2022 | NO | 22.09.2022 | GR | 23.09.2022 | IS | 22.10.2022 | PT | 24.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY] - YAKUN ZHANG ET AL, "Rapid determination of soluble protein content for soybean leaves based on near infrared spectroscopy", NONGYE GONGCHENG XUEBAO = TRANSACTIONS CHINESE SOCIETY OF AGRICULTURAL ENGINEERING, CN, (20180915), vol. 34, doi:10.11975/j.issn.1002-6819.2018.18.023, ISSN 1002-6819, pages 187 - 193, XP055733975 [I] 1,2,9 * the whole document * [Y] 3-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.11975/j.issn.1002-6819.2018.18.023 | [Y] - WEIGUO LU ET AL, "Identification of the quantitative trait loci (QTL) underlying water soluble protein content in soybean", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS ; INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PLANT BREEDING RESEARCH, Berlin, DE, (20121007), vol. 126, no. 2, doi:10.1007/s00122-012-1990-8, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 425 - 433, XP055734277 [Y] 3-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-012-1990-8 | [A] - WANG JINSHUI ET AL, "Measurement of protein content in sesame by near-infrared spectroscopy technique", NEW TECHNOLOGY OF AGRICULTURAL ENGINEERING (ICAE), 2011 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110527), doi:10.1109/ICAE.2011.5943978, ISBN 978-1-4244-9574-0, pages 1092 - 1095, XP031955814 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICAE.2011.5943978 | [XP] - XU RUIXIN ET AL, "Use of near-infrared spectroscopy for the rapid evaluation of soybean [Glycine max (L.) Merri.] water soluble protein content", SPECTROCHIMICA ACTA. PART A: MOLECULAR AND BIOMOLECULAR SPECTROSCOPY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 224, doi:10.1016/J.SAA.2019.117400, ISSN 1386-1425, (20190814), (20190814), XP085864144 [XP] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.saa.2019.117400 | Examination | - Baianu I. ET AL, "Determination of Soybean Oil, Protein and Amino Acid Residues in Soybean Seeds by High Resolution Nuclear Magnetic Resonance (NMRS) and Near Infrared (NIRS).", Nature Precedings, doi:10.1038/npre.2012.7053.1, (20120402), URL: http://www.nature.com/articles/npre.2012.7053.1, XP055805621 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/npre.2012.7053.1 |