EP3904682 - METHOD FOR MONITORING AND CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF A PUMP STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xylem Europe GmbH Bleicheplatz 6 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÖKANDER, Jürgen 192 78 Sollentuna / SE | 02 /
WESSMAN, Martin 169 40 Solna / SE | 03 /
ALDENFALK, Staffan 171 55 Solna / SE | [2021/44] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [2023/48] |
Former [2021/44] | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Drottninggatan 27 103 59 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 20171480.5 | 27.04.2020 | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3904682 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3904682 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F04D13/14, F04D15/02, F04D29/60, F04B15/02, F04B23/02, F04B49/06, E03F5/22, F04D13/16, G05B23/02 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
F04B15/02 (EP);
G05B23/0283 (EP,US);
E03F5/22 (EP,US);
F04B23/021 (EP);
F04B49/065 (EP);
F04D13/14 (EP);
F04D13/16 (EP);
F04D15/029 (EP);
F04D29/607 (EP);
F04B2203/0208 (EP);
F04B2205/05 (EP);
F04B2205/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | F04B15/02, E03F5/22, F04B23/02, F04B49/06, F04D13/16, G05B23/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] |
Former [2021/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND STEUERUNG DES BETRIEBS EINER PUMPSTATION | [2021/44] | English: | METHOD FOR MONITORING AND CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF A PUMP STATION | [2021/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER ET DE COMMANDER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE STATION DE POMPAGE | [2021/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 25.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.08.2024
30.08.2024
ADMISSIBLE KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Straße 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE Opponent's representative von Tietzen und Hennig, Nikolaus Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.08.2024
KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Straße 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE Opponent's representative von Tietzen und Hennig, Nikolaus Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | 12.09.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011081255 (STEGER PERRY C [US], et al); | [XAI]EP2746477 (GRUNDFOS HOLDING AS [DK]); | [AD]WO2016132107 (PULSAR PROCESS MEASUREMENT LTD [GB]); | [XAI]EP3567256 (GRUNDFOS HOLDING AS [DK]) | by applicant | WO2016132107 | Opposition | GB2432219 | US2013164146 | EP2746477 | EP2944821 | WO2016132107 | WO2019081524 | EP3567256 |