EP3904623 - DOOR HANDLE ARRANGEMENT WITH INNER AND OUTER HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrilås I Nässjö AB Box 214 571 23 Nässjö / SE | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hjertqvist, Eric 571 23 Nässjö / SE | [2021/44] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Östra Storgatan 7 553 21 Jönköping / SE | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 20171625.5 | 27.04.2020 | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3904623 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3904623 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E05B13/10, // E05B13/00, E05B65/00, E05B63/00, E05B17/00 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
E05B63/0069 (EP);
E05B13/101 (EP);
E05B65/0053 (EP);
E05B13/004 (EP);
E05B17/005 (EP);
E05B63/0013 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | E05B13/10, // E05B13/00, E05B65/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2021/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TÜRGRIFFANORDNUNG MIT INNEN- UND AUSSENGRIFF | [2021/44] | English: | DOOR HANDLE ARRANGEMENT WITH INNER AND OUTER HANDLE | [2021/44] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE POIGNÉE DE PORTE AVEC POIGNÉE INTERNE ET EXTERNE | [2021/44] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 06.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3037623 (TELEWIG WEIGELT GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,14,15 * page 11, line 23 - page 22, line 20; figures 1-4 * [A] 6,7; | [X]EP0919680 (STEINBACH & VOLLMANN [DE]) [X] 1,14,15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-8a *; | [A]US2001027666 (NEELEY ROCKY E [US]) [A] 1-6,8,9,15 * paragraphs [0026] , [0053] , [0054]; figures 1-6B *; | [XA]EP1344882 (STEINBACH & VOLLMANN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8,14,15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015]; figures 1-4 * [A] 5; | [A]EP2213817 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,8-15* figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP2581528 (PASTORE & LOMBARDI SRL [IT]) [X] 1,2,15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1-14 * |