EP3817416 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SWITCHING NFC CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airstar Digital Technology Co., Ltd. Room 803, 8th Floor, Building 5 No. 15 Kechuang 10th Street Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing / CN | [2021/48] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states Xiaomi Digital Technology Co., Ltd. No. 2243, 2nd Floor, Building D, Building 33 No. 99, Kechuang 14th Street Beijing Economic and Technological Developement Zone Beijing 100176 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Lina Room 803, 8th Floor, Building 5, No. 15, Kechuang 10th Street Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing / CN | 02 /
GE, Xudong Room 803, 8th Floor, Building 5, No. 15, Kechuang 10th Street Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing / CN | 03 /
LI, Shilei Room 803, 8th Floor, Building 5, No. 15, Kechuang 10th Street Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing / CN | [2021/48] |
Former [2021/18] | 01 /
XU, Lina No. 2243, 2nd Floor, Building D, Building 33 No. 99, Kechuang 14th Street Beijing Economic and Technological Development Zone Beijing, Beijing 100176 / CN | ||
02 /
GE, Xudong No. 2243, 2nd Floor, Building D, Building 33 No. 99, Kechuang 14th Street Beijing Economic and Technological Development Zone Beijing, Beijing 100176 / CN | |||
03 /
LI, Shilei No. 2243, 2nd Floor, Building D, Building 33 No. 99, Kechuang 14th Street Beijing Economic and Technological Development Zone Beijing, Beijing 100176 / CN | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 20171832.7 | 28.04.2020 | [2021/18] | Priority number, date | CN20191163194 | 31.10.2019 Original published format: CN201911063194 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3817416 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3817416 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/80 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
H04W4/80 (EP,CN,US);
G06K7/10297 (CN);
H04B5/70 (CN);
H04M1/72412 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2021/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHALTEN EINER NFC-KARTE | [2021/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SWITCHING NFC CARD | [2021/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA COMMUTATION DE CARTE NFC | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 15.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2584769 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,11,13 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0018] , [0019] , [0024] , [0027] , [0030] * [I] 3,4,6,9,10,12; | [XI]US2014222670 (CONCANNON AARON [GB]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,11,13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0018] - [0023] *[I] 3,4,6,9,10,12; | [XI] - Mifare4mobile, "Specification MIFARE4Mobile - Guidance Manual", (20131223), URL: http://www.mifare4mobile.org/wp-content/uploads/2015/09/MIFARE4Mobile-Guidance.2.1.pdf, (20151104), XP055225895 [X] 1,2,5,7,8,11,13 * Section 6.1, 6.3 and 6.3.3 * [I] 3,4,6,9,10,12 |