Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
26.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.02.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
18.10.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
14.10.2022 | First examination report | |
19.07.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.08.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
20.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
20.08.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
20.08.2021 | Change - designated states | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
16.08.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.01.2021 | Publication of search report | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
22.01.2021 | Change - classification | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
22.01.2021 | Change - classification | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
28.09.2020 | Change - classification | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
28.09.2020 | Change - classification | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
04.09.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] |
26.08.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.05.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.04.2020 | Change - representative |