EP3904230 - PORTION CONTAINER, CONTAINER MIXING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suppsolution GmbH Gertrudstrasse 5 8400 Winterthur / CH | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stettler, Mike 8400 Winterthur / CH | [2021/44] | Representative(s) | Liebetanz, Michael Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 20172407.7 | 30.04.2020 | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3904230 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/28 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
B65D51/2835 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2021/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORTIONSBEHÄLTER, BEHÄLTERMISCHSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/44] | English: | PORTION CONTAINER, CONTAINER MIXING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE THEREFOR | [2021/44] | French: | RÉCIPIENT DE PORTIONS, SYSTÈME DE MÉLANGE DE RÉCIPIENT ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉ | [2021/44] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 05.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5543042 (FILAN FINBARR J [IE], et al) [X] 13* column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 45; figure - *; | [X]JPH1059373 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0028]; figures 5-7 *; | [A]US2003213709 (GIBLER GREGORY A [US], et al) [A] 10 * figure - *; | [X]JP2005247382 (NIPPON TANSAN GAS CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraphs [0026] - [0037]; figure - *; | [A]WO2006046730 (COCA COLA CO [US], et al) [A] 7,8 * figure - *; | [XI]EP2700589 (LEE SEONG-JAE [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,12 * paragraph [0132]; figures 72, 99, 120 * [I] 5,7,8,10,11,14; | [X]WO2017046420 (BEVASWISS AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,12 * paragraph [0016] *; | [XI]CN107985788 (BEIJING BEIJING 3D DIGITAL TECH CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-4,6,9 * paragraphs [0040] - [0044]; figure 2 * [I] 5,7,8,10,11,14; | [X]CH714331 (BEVASWISS AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,12 * paragraphs [0007] - [0017] * | by applicant | WO9944901 | EP1795457 | EP2298664 | WO2014056079 | EP2752373 | WO2017146625 |