EP3721862 - ORAL CARE PREPARATIONS COMPRISING CHLORHEXIDINE AND ARGININE OR THEIR SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meda AB Pipers Väg 2A 170 73 Solna / SE | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FILIPPI, Elisabetta c/o MEDA AB Pipers väg 2A 17073 Solna / SE | 02 /
ZANARDI, Andrea c/o MEDA AB Pipers väg 2A 17073 Solna / SE | 03 /
GELFI, Elena c/o MEDA AB Pipers väg 2A 17073 Solna / SE | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 20172577.7 | 13.01.2020 | [2020/42] | Priority number, date | EP20190151526 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19151526 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3721862 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3721862 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/36, A61K8/43, A61K8/44, A61Q11/00, A61K9/08, A61K47/36, A61K9/00, A61K31/155 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K8/43 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K8/27 (CN);
A61K31/155 (EP);
A61K31/198 (EP);
A61K8/361 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/155, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/42] | A61K8/36, A61K8/43, A61K8/44, A61Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 13.04.2021 | ME | 13.04.2021 | Title | German: | MUNDPFLEGEPRÄPARATE ENTHALTEND CHLORHEXIDIN UND ARGININE ODER IHRE SALZE | [2020/42] | English: | ORAL CARE PREPARATIONS COMPRISING CHLORHEXIDINE AND ARGININE OR THEIR SALTS | [2020/42] | French: | PRÉPARATIONS DE SOINS BUCCAUX COMPRENANT DE LA CHLORHEXIDINE ET DE L' ARGININE OU LEURS SELS | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 13.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2023 | Observations by third parties | 10.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 17.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20700704.8 / EP3697380 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 17.06.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 17.06.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015313813 (REGE AARTI [US], et al) | Examination | WO2017096000 | by applicant | WO0051559 | other | WO2017096000 |